NY S05163 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an excavator to notify 911 in the event of an electrical short or the escape of gas or hazardous fluids endangering life where damage has resulted to an underground facility.
Title
Requires an excavator to notify 911 in the event of an electrical short or the escape of gas or hazardous fluids endangering life where damage has resulted to an underground facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.505 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1189 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5163 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.271 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-18 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7287 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1189 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07287 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.505