NY S05164 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that estimations, measures, or calculations of past, present or future damages for lost earnings or impaired earning capacity resulting from personal injury or wrongful death shall not be reduced based on race, creed, color, national origin, religion, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, military status, sex, familial status, marital status, or status as a victim of domestic violence.
Title
Provides that estimations, measures, or calculations of past, present or future damages for lost earnings or impaired earning capacity resulting from personal injury or wrongful death shall not be reduced based on race, creed, color, national origin, religion, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, military status, sex, familial status, marital status, or status as a victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.456 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5164B |
2020-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5164A |
2020-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |