NY S05167 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for state agencies, municipalities, and authorities to provide state or local public benefits regardless of immigration status.
Title
Allows for state agencies, municipalities, and authorities to provide state or local public benefits regardless of immigration status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07742 (Same As) 2019-08-02 - enacting clause stricken
A10433 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - referred to social services
A10433 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - referred to social services