NY S05180 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to individuals who are nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices to submit a certificate of acceptance.
Title
Relates to individuals who are nominated to serve on the committee to receive notices to submit a certificate of acceptance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Senate | approval memo.11 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | signed chap.456 |
2019-10-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1774 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5180A |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-26 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.143 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5219 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1774 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5180A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05219 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - approval memo.11