NY S05186 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a residential-commercial real property tax exemption program.
Title
Establishes a residential-commercial real property tax exemption program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5186B |
2011-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5186A |
2011-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |