NY S05186 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the lupus research enhancement program; creates the lupus research enhancement fund.
Title
Creates the lupus research enhancement program; creates the lupus research enhancement fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00539 (Same As) 2013-11-22 - enacting clause stricken
A08462 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - referred to health
A08462 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - referred to health