NY S05190 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for recall; empowers the electors with the ability to remove elective officers.
Title
Provides for recall; empowers the electors with the ability to remove elective officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |