NY S05190 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to counsel fees and expenses in matrimonial actions.
Title
Relates to counsel fees and expenses in matrimonial actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7221 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.591 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07221 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - signed chap.447