NY S05190 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the energy storage deployment program to encourage the installation of qualified energy storage systems; relates to commercially available technology that is capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and thereafter dispatching the energy.
Title
Establishes the energy storage deployment program to encourage the installation of qualified energy storage systems; relates to commercially available technology that is capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and thereafter dispatching the energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6571 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1887 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06571 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - approval memo.20