NY S05191 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Title
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.699 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.506 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5191 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.441 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-01 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7418 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.506 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07418 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699