NY S05196 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to conduct an investigation prior to removing a species from the endangered and threatened species list.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to conduct an investigation prior to removing a species from the endangered and threatened species list.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.345 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1026 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04077 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170