NY S05198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to eliminating the statute of limitations for certain crimes of rape and criminal sexual act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to eliminating the statute of limitations for certain crimes of rape and criminal sexual act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.674
2019-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 5198A
2019-05-09SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2019-04-15SenateREFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback