NY S05200 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deems the objects or purposes for which certain bonds were issued by the county of Erie to be the Erie canal harbor waterfront development, the purchase of vehicles and heavy equipment, and bridge and road reconstruction projects; authorizes the expenditure of the proceeds from such bonds for such objects or purposes.
Title
Deems the objects or purposes for which certain bonds were issued by the county of Erie to be the Erie canal harbor waterfront development, the purchase of vehicles and heavy equipment, and bridge and road reconstruction projects; authorizes the expenditure of the proceeds from such bonds for such objects or purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.385 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2948 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1371 |
2011-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02948 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - substituted by s5200