NY S05200 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the Town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the Town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.246 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.541 |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a6742 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06742 (Same As) 2017-06-06 - substituted by s5200