NY S05204 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 25, "Medal of Honor Day", as a day of commemoration.
Title
Designates March 25, "Medal of Honor Day", as a day of commemoration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06095 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations