NY S05206 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the minimum qualifications to serve as a fire chief in any fire department, fire district or fire protection district that employs six or more paid firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the minimum qualifications to serve as a fire chief in any fire department, fire district or fire protection district that employs six or more paid firefighters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.525
2019-04-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07133 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback