NY S05207 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of law enforcement; includes every non-seasonally appointed sworn member or officer of the division of law enforcement in the department of environmental conservation, a forest ranger in the service of the department of environmental conservation, a police officer in the department of environmental conservation, the regional state park police, and university police officers in such twenty year plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.640
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4431
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1253
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-04-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04431 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5207

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback