NY S05217 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to five-year capital plans for the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Title
Relates to five-year capital plans for the state university of New York and the city university of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.267 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7388 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07388 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5217