NY S05221 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.310
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Mandates the creation of a reference list of businesses that provide locator technology designed to assist in the expedited location of individuals afflicted with Alzheimer's disease or dementia who become lost or disoriented.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandates the creation of a reference list of businesses that provide locator technology designed to assist in the expedited location of individuals afflicted with Alzheimer's disease or dementia who become lost or disoriented.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.310
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.401
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a1118a
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1758
2018-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 5221A
2018-06-01SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2017-03-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A01118 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5221a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback