NY S05224 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Title
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.561 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.131 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4949b |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1607 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5224B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5224A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04949 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.561