NY S05225 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to require the submission of physicians', physicians' assistants or nurse practitioners' statements on a scheduled basis under certain circumstances; relates to the licensing of drivers where there is evidence of the loss of consciousness by such person; defines "loss of consciousness"; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to require the submission of physicians', physicians' assistants or nurse practitioners' statements on a scheduled basis under certain circumstances; relates to the licensing of drivers where there is evidence of the loss of consciousness by such person; defines "loss of consciousness"; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.85 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.740 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4751a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1431 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5225A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
S01071 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
A04751 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.85
A04751 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.85