NY S05229 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that bond anticipation notes issued during calendar years 2009 and 2010 may not extend more than seven years beyond the original date of issuance of such bond notes.
Title
Provides that bond anticipation notes issued during calendar years 2009 and 2010 may not extend more than seven years beyond the original date of issuance of such bond notes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5229A |
2013-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07355 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT