NY S05229 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5229A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5229A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care; enhances tax credits for long term health care insurance premiums.
Title
Establishes tax credits for premiums paid for life insurance which is used for long term health care; enhances tax credits for long term health care insurance premiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5229A |
2016-01-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07603 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - print number 7603a