NY S05232 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the Morning Star Missionary Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits the Morning Star Missionary Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.434
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a7323
2019-05-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.576
2019-04-17SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07323 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - substituted by s5232

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback