NY S05233 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Mount Moriah Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits Mount Moriah Baptist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.351 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.547 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a7326 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.797 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07326 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.351