NY S05234 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Church of Jesus Christ to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Church of Jesus Christ to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.425 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.435 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7325 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.798 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07325 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.425