NY S05235 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Northeastern Association of the Blind at Albany, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Northeastern Association of the Blind at Albany, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.563 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.548 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a7327 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.577 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07327 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.563