NY S05236 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the joint underwriting association.
Title
Relates to the joint underwriting association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.542 |
2013-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7829a |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2013-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1451 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07829 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - substituted by s5236