NY S05246 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to presumptive evidence of disability caused by cancer of firefighters who have been retired for five years or less.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to presumptive evidence of disability caused by cancer of firefighters who have been retired for five years or less.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.250
2019-09-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.655
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7716a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5246A
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.847
2019-04-18SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A07716 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5246a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback