NY S05248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - SIGNED CHAP.93
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits wage differentials based on protected class status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits wage differentials based on protected class status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10AssemblySIGNED CHAP.93
2019-07-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.470
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a8093a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5248B
2019-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5248A
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.641
2019-04-18SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A08093 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s5248b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05248&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05248&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05248
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05248&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05248A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05248&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05248B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5248#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5248#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05248&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback