NY S05249 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the legislature from transferring funds from the power authority of the state of New York into the general fund.
Title
Prohibits the legislature from transferring funds from the power authority of the state of New York into the general fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-24 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |