NY S05253 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.121
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.121
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland.
Title
Limits the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Senate | signed chap.121 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.799 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5253A |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.546 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Senate | print number 7310a |
2019-05-01 | Senate | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-04-22 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7310A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.799 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5253A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07310 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - signed chap.121