NY S05254 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residential-commercial urban exemption program; requires the owner to submit an annual certification to the assessor attesting that the property complies with the requirements of this section.
Title
Relates to the residential-commercial urban exemption program; requires the owner to submit an annual certification to the assessor attesting that the property complies with the requirements of this section.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.59 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.357 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.884 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5254B |
2020-07-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8091a |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-08 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2020-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.310 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1776 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5254A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.423 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.423 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8091A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.884 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5254B |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8091 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1776 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5254A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03483 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
A08091 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.59
A08091 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.59