NY S05267 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Title
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] |
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5267A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06968 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - print number 6968b