NY S05267 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the New York city condominium and cooperative tax abatement for dwelling units whose billable assessed value is two hundred thousand dollars or greater and instructs that the money used to formerly fund such abatement be reallocated to the New York city housing authority; extends certain provisions of the partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Eliminates the New York city condominium and cooperative tax abatement for dwelling units whose billable assessed value is two hundred thousand dollars or greater and instructs that the money used to formerly fund such abatement be reallocated to the New York city housing authority; extends certain provisions of the partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5267A |
2020-08-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07092 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - print number 7092b