NY S05276 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to support orders for adult dependent children; provides that parents or kinship caregivers of an adult child under the age of 26 are chargeable with support of such individual provided such individual is diagnosed with a developmental disability as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.
Title
Relates to support orders for adult dependent children; provides that parents or kinship caregivers of an adult child under the age of 26 are chargeable with support of such individual provided such individual is diagnosed with a developmental disability as defined in section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5276B |
2019-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5276A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06658 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES