NY S05282 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Title
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7662b |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.885 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5282B |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5282A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07662 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307