NY S05285 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Title
Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.476 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1022 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5285A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.321 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.321 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-23 | Senate | print number 1093b |
2019-05-23 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-08 | Senate | print number 1093a |
2019-04-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1093B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1022 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5285A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01093 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.476