NY S05286 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement plan for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Title
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement plan for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.460 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7615a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1016 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07615 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS