NY S05288 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of state route 102 in the hamlet of Uniondale, Nassau county, beginning at the intersection of Uniondale Avenue and Front Street and ending at the intersection of Hawthorne Avenue and Front Street, as "Melvin Harris, Jr. Way".
Title
Designates a portion of state route 102 in the hamlet of Uniondale, Nassau county, beginning at the intersection of Uniondale Avenue and Front Street and ending at the intersection of Hawthorne Avenue and Front Street, as "Melvin Harris, Jr. Way".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | signed chap.102 |
2019-07-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1590 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5288 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.174 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.174 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7497 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1590 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07497 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - signed chap.102