NY S05294 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to bicycles with electronic assist and electric scooters; defines terms; provides that every person riding an electric scooter upon a roadway shall be granted all of the rights and shall be subject to all of the duties applicable to the driver of a vehicle; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to bicycles with electronic assist and electric scooters; defines terms; provides that every person riding an electric scooter upon a roadway shall be granted all of the rights and shall be subject to all of the duties applicable to the driver of a vehicle; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.650
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7431b
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1667
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5294A
2019-06-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-04-23SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07431 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5294a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback