NY S05305 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the transfer or lease of closed electric generators; requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Title
Relates to the transfer or lease of closed electric generators; requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.907 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5305B |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5305A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |