NY S05312 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the state board of real property tax services to conduct a study on real property tax saturation.
Title
Relates to directing the state board of real property tax services to conduct a study on real property tax saturation.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.320 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5312A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1556 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07993 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation