NY S05322 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.582
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.582
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to all plumbing and electrical work performed on school buildings in Nassau or Suffolk county.
Title
Relates to all plumbing and electrical work performed on school buildings in Nassau or Suffolk county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.582 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7804a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5322A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07804 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s5322a