NY S05323 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authority to BOCES to lease real property to July 1, 2024.
Title
Extends authority to BOCES to lease real property to July 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.61 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.709 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5323 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.264 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-24 | Senate | print number 6671a |
2019-04-24 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6671A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.709 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06671 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.61