NY S05324 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the cap on assessment increases for class one dwellings shall not apply to dwellings assessed at over three million dollars where the owners have a gross household income not exceeding $250,000.
Title
Provides that the cap on assessment increases for class one dwellings shall not apply to dwellings assessed at over three million dollars where the owners have a gross household income not exceeding $250,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5324B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5324A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |