NY S05334 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5334A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5334A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state drinking water bill of rights.
Title
Enacts the New York state drinking water bill of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5334A |
2020-03-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03361 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - advanced to third reading cal.472