NY S05339 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written request, including environmental impact statement, and review by community boards, borough presidents and the council of proposed reductions in the level of fire services, including closure of firehouses or removal or relocation of fire fighting units.
Title
Requires written request, including environmental impact statement, and review by community boards, borough presidents and the council of proposed reductions in the level of fire services, including closure of firehouses or removal or relocation of fire fighting units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.138 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.848 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00455 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to cities