NY S05347 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Instructs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to make available on the office website, information regarding the process for individuals to obtain eligibility for services and to seek access to services.
Title
Instructs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to make available on the office website, information regarding the process for individuals to obtain eligibility for services and to seek access to services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.542 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.739 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5347 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.259 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-22 | Senate | print number 6344a |
2019-04-22 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2019-03-06 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6344A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.739 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06344 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.542