NY S05348 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - approval memo.71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - approval memo.71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the grounds for the suspension of a driver's license; provides for additional notification when a person is required to make an appearance; requires income based payment plans to be available for fines, fees and mandatory surcharges incurred as a result of a violation of the vehicle and traffic law and makes conforming changes.
Title
Limits the grounds for the suspension of a driver's license; provides for additional notification when a person is required to make an appearance; requires income based payment plans to be available for fines, fees and mandatory surcharges incurred as a result of a violation of the vehicle and traffic law and makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | approval memo.71 |
2020-12-31 | Senate | signed chap.382 |
2020-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.782 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5348B |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.170 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.170 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-31 | Senate | print number 7463b |
2020-01-31 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-19 | Senate | reference changed to codes |
2019-06-13 | Senate | print number 7463a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-06 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7463B |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.782 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5348B |
2020-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1692 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5348A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07463 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - approval memo.71